California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 15, 2017

Amended

Bill June 15, 2017
Bill April 4, 2017
Bill March 14, 2017