|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 2432.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1065.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 826.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|