|
10/14/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 805, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2583.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2957.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Published April 27 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 855.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|