|
10/06/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 536, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 29. Page 2856.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 872.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Published April 19 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|