Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1320.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1180.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 851.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 625.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|