Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
June 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
July 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 1390.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 826.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
April 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|