|
10/09/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2853.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 870.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|