Assembly | 09/05/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2017 | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2017 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 1309.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 1021.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |