Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 830.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 585.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2017 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and V.A. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |