|
10/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Ordered to enrgrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2017
|
Held at desk.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2017
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 2763.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1066.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 829.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|