|
10/14/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 806, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2789.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3157.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 766.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|