|
03/03/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2017
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3204.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1354.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 538.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|