Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Set for hearing March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |