|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2835.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3151.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2474.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1321.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|