California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB30 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2018

Amended

Bill June 21, 2018
Bill May 30, 2018
Bill August 31, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill February 16, 2017