California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill June 13, 2017