Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 25). | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |