California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB31 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 15, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017
Bill February 27, 2017
Bill January 24, 2017