California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2017

Amended

Bill August 24, 2017
Bill April 26, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017
Bill March 16, 2017