California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2017

Chaptered

Bill July 17, 2017

Amended

Bill June 7, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017