07/10/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2017. | |||
07/10/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2017 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1679.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2017 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2259.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2017 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 768.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 4). | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |