|
10/15/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 857, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3205.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 829.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|