California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2017

Amended

Bill August 24, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017