Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2018 | January 10 hearing: Heard for testimony only. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2018 | Set for hearing January 11 in T. & H. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2018 | Set for hearing January 10. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | April 5 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |