|
09/29/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2958.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 3420.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3417.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1396.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1176.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
May 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 884.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 327.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Set for hearing March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
February 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2017
|
Set for hearing February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|