California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB351 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 5, 2017
Bill April 4, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017