07/10/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2017. | |||
07/10/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/26/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2259.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2017 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 583.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28). | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |