|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 516, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2855.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
June 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
June 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|