Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 371.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Set for hearing March 15. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2017 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |