Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 18 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
April 4 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
March 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|