Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | May 8 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 1006.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |