|
10/13/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 772, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3218.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1356.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1183.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|