California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017