Assembly | 07/03/2017 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2017 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 643.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 430.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Set for hearing March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |