|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 121, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2474.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 539.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|