|
10/04/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 479, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2920.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2866.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2726.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 3152.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1400.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 744.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 536.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 327.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Set for hearing March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H., EQ., and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|