|
10/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 568, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2991.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2941.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2814.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3217.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|