California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB408

Introduced
2/15/17  
Introduced
2/15/17  
Refer
2/23/17  
Refer
2/23/17  
Failed
2/1/18  

Caption

Income taxes withholding: exemption: active duty residents.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

CA AB2529

Income taxation: like kind exchanges: withholding.

CA SB352

Income taxes: withholding: real property sales.

CA AB1582

Income taxes: withholding: real property sales: Katz-Harris Taxpayers’ Bill of Rights Act: report.

IA SF565

A bill for an act relating to state and local finance and the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1148.) Effective date: 06/01/2023, 07/01/2023, 01/01/2024, 01/01/2026. Applicability date: 01/01/2023, 07/01/2024.

CA AB2660

Income taxes: administration: nonresident aliens: identifying numbers: group filing.

IA HF715

A bill for an act relating to state and local finance and the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 187.)

CA SB628

Employment: employer contributions: employee withholdings: credit: agricultural employees.

CA SB375

Employment: employer contributions: employee withholdings: COVID-19 regulatory compliance credit.