Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1356.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 540.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|