Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 540.) (March 28). | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |