California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Amended

Bill June 22, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017
Bill March 7, 2017