Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2017 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |