|
09/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 238, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Published May 15 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 784.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|