Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2853.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 886.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|