|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 647, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2893.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3269.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 913.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|