|
10/09/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2905.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3165.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Published May 17 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 744.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
March 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|