|
09/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 239, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 535.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|