|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2927.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3270.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2021.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1942.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Set for hearing July 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1663.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Set for hearing June 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
March 29 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|