Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 2 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 945.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |