Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 884.) (April 26). | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 783.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |